FL H0171 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 366 (Ch. 2019-143)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 366 (Ch. 2019-143)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes county commission to establish sterile needle & syringe exchange program; prohibits operation of such program under certain conditions; provides requirements for operation of such program; requires collection of data & submission of reports; provides for immunity from civil liability under certain circumstances; authorizes continuation of specified pilot program under certain circumstances.
Title
Infectious Disease Elimination Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 366 (Ch. 2019-143) |
2019-04-17 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 366 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-04-03 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-28 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S366 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-143