FL S0366 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Infectious Disease Elimination Act (IDEA)"; providing that a county commission may authorize a sterile needle and syringe exchange program; requiring the development of an oversight and accountability system for certain purposes; providing for immunity from civil liability, under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Infectious Disease Elimination Programs
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Oscar Braynon [D] | Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Linda Stewart [D] | Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#182 (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#182 (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Chapter No. 2019-143 | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2019-05-02 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Concurred in 2 amendment(s) (517403, 836647) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In returning messages |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 3 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (517403, 836647) |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 171 |
2019-04-11 | House | Received |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2019-04-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/28/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled |
2019-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/27/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/06/19, 4:15 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/19/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H171 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 366 (Ch. 2019-143)