FL H0181 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on September 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 268 -HJ 1118
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 268 -HJ 1118
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Cites act as "John Anthony Wilson Bicycle Safety Act"; provides for DEP to enter into concession agreements for commercial sponsorship displays on certain state greenway & trail facilities or property; provides for distribution of proceeds from such concession agreements.
Title
Sponsorship of State Greenways and Trails
Sponsors
House Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee | House Appropriations Committee | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Rep. Ari Porth [D] |
Rep. Irving Slosberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 268 -HJ 1118 | |
2012-03-06 | Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 268 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 738 | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1 -HJ 738 | |
2012-02-20 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/22/12, 9:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-02-17 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 682 | |
2012-02-16 | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time -HJ 660 | |
2012-02-16 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-15 | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -HJ 669 | |
2012-02-13 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/15/12, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-24 | Now in Appropriations Committee -HJ 282 | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable by Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 -HJ 282 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee, 01/24/12, 2:00 pm, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 220 | |
2012-01-17 | Now in Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee -HJ 246 | |
2012-01-13 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-11 | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 227 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 21 | |
2012-01-09 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 01/11/12, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB | |
2011-10-03 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 21 | |
2011-09-21 | Filed |