FL H0215 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 436 -HJ 1115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 436 -HJ 1115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises definition of term "place & time when person has reasonable expectation of privacy" to include interior of residential dwelling; increases classification of specified video voyeurism offenses.
Title
Video Voyeurism
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D] | Rep. Chris Dorworth [R] | Rep. John Julien [D] | Rep. Martin Kiar [D] |
Rep. Larry Metz [R] | Rep. Mark Pafford [D] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] | Rep. Irving Slosberg [D] |
Sen. Dana Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 436 -HJ 1115 | |
2012-03-06 | Substituted SB 436 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/12 | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 298 | |
2012-01-25 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 298 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/25/12, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-11 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 217 | |
2012-01-11 | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 217 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 24 | |
2012-01-09 | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/11/12, 8:30 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-12-06 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 175 | |
2011-12-06 | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 175 | |
2011-11-29 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 12/06/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-10-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 24 | |
2011-09-26 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
810 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/215 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0215/BillText/Filed/HTML |