FL H0241 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1082 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes court to take certain actions regarding care, possession, or control of animal in domestic violence actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Violence Injunctions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseLaid on Table Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1082 passed
2020-03-10HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-09HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-07HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2020-02-07HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-06HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-02-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-22HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-22HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2020-01-22HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2020-01-22HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-21HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-10HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-09-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1082 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-37

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
74130Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback