FL H0309 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines term "specialty technologist" as it relates to certification of radiological personnel; provides titles for persons who hold certificate as specialty technologist; authorizes person holding certificate as specialty technologist to perform specific duties allowed for specialty technologist as defined by DOH; requires that duties fall within scope of practice of specialty as set by national organization for particular advanced, postprimary, or specialty area; provides criteria for certification as specialty technologist; provides for applicant for certification as specialty technologist to be certified only by endorsement rather than by examination; authorizes department to issue certificate by endorsement to practice as specialty technologist to applicant who meets certain criteria.
Title
Radiological Personnel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1068 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1068 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1146 | |
2012-03-06 | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 873 | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 873 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 814 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 1082 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1081 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1028 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 908 | |
2012-02-27 | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 908 | |
2012-02-24 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/27/12, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-21 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 689 | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 689 | |
2012-02-17 | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/21/12, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-19 | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 235 | |
2012-01-19 | Original reference(s) removed: Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 221 | |
2012-01-17 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-12 | CS by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 228 | |
2012-01-10 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee, 01/12/12, 8:00 am, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 31 | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 31 | |
2011-10-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
468 | 3003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 3065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |