FL H0401 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises & creates various provisions of law relating to State Fire Marshal, including building & equipment inspection duties, establishment of Fire Code Interpretation Committee, requirements for nonbinding & binding interpretations of Florida Fire Prevention Code, firefighter eligibility, examination, training, level, certification, employment, & supplemental compensation requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Fire Marshal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173)
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; General Government Policy Council -HJ 00039
2009-12-18 Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; General Government Policy Council
2009-11-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0531 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176)
H0629 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 1136; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176) -HJ 01129
H0663 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-176; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
S0648 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01005; Amendment(s) adopted (772328, 404418, 337832, 298178, 169094) -SJ 01007; Substituted CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 -SJ 01007; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 01007
S1074 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Higher Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176)
S1136 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-173; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176)
S0832 (Similar To) 2010-04-08 - Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00522; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173) -SJ 00522

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
021823Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0447203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0489103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
059002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
063330Amended CodeSee Bill Text
063334Amended CodeSee Bill Text
063335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633382Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633524Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633537Amended CodeSee Bill Text
063372Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633811Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0633821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101312Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback