FL H0629 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 1136; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176) -HJ 01129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 1136; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176) -HJ 01129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides exceptions to specified local government firesafety inspection requirements; specifies inspection requirements for fire hydrants owned by governmental entities; authorizes local government utilities to comply using designated employees; specifies responsibility for ensuring qualification of designated employees to make inspections.
Title
Firesafety Inspections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 1136; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176) -HJ 01129 | |
2010-04-12 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00663 | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00663 | |
2010-04-07 | On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 04/09/10, 11:45 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00341; Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00341 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/17/10, 9:30 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-11 | Favorable by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00268; Now in Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) -HJ 00269 | |
2010-03-09 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 03/11/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00057 | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); General Government Policy Council | |
2010-01-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0401 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173)
S0832 (Similar To) 2010-04-08 - Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00522; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173) -SJ 00522
S1136 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-173; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176)
H0663 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-176; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
S0648 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01005; Amendment(s) adopted (772328, 404418, 337832, 298178, 169094) -SJ 01007; Substituted CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 -SJ 01007; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 01007
S0832 (Similar To) 2010-04-08 - Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00522; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173) -SJ 00522
S1136 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-173; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176)
H0663 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-176; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
S0648 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01005; Amendment(s) adopted (772328, 404418, 337832, 298178, 169094) -SJ 01007; Substituted CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 -SJ 01007; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 01007
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0633 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0633 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |