FL H0615 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises powers & duties of district school board to authorize adoption of rules regarding procurement practices; defines "electronic auction services"; authorizes district school board's use of electronic auction services in conjunction with bid pooling for school buses & related purchases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Auction Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-27HouseNow in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-27HouseCS referred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2015-03-27HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2015-03-25HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-24HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-18HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2015-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0574 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
S1264 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100627Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287057Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback