FL H0633 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Mental Health & Substance Use Disorder Awareness & Assistance Training Program; requires DCF to establish program; provides program requirements; requires DCF to select coordinating agency; provides requirements for such coordinating agency; requires coordinating agency to submit reports to DCF.
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Awareness and Assistance Training Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-30 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-11-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1332 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/633 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/633/BillText/Filed/PDF |