FL H0827 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for licensure of recovery care centers by AHCA; provides criteria for admission of patients to recovery care centers; requires centers to have specified protocols; prohibits centers from providing services to children until standards are established; requires AHCA to adopt minimum standards for centers; directs AHCA to enforce specified provisions of Florida Building Code applicable to recovery care centers; exempts centers from specified minimum licensure requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recovery Care Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#463 (Y: 81 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-02SenateReceived
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Rules
2020-02-26SenateIn Messages
2020-02-20HouseCS passed; YEAS 81 NAYS 36
2020-02-20HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-19HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-02-19HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
2020-02-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-02-10HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-06HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
2020-02-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-28HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-28HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-16HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-15HouseFavorable by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-12-16HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-11-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7021 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
385211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944787Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3950171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39510973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409975Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback