FL H0883 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring DOE to maintain a disqualification list of individuals; revises provisions relating to employment & termination of public school & private school employees; revises duties of DOE, Commissioner of Education, & school districts relating to employee conduct & employment & termination of public school & private school employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied on Calendar
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-17HouseCS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2020-02-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-14HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-12HouseCS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-02-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Reed Hall
2020-02-04HouseNow in Education Committee
2020-02-04HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-24HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-23HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-23HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-21HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-01-16HousePCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-12HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-12-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S534 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7065 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1006061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012795Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012796Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012797Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback