FL H0943 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides conditions under which neighborhood improvement district may borrow money, contract loans, & issue bonds, certificates, warrants, notes, or other evidence of indebtedness & may pledge special assessment power of district to pay such debts for purpose of financing certain capital projects.
Title
Neighborhood Improvement Districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1496 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
S992 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
S992 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/943 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0943/BillText/Filed/PDF |