FL S0992 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a city ordinance creating a neighborhood improvement district may authorize the district to borrow money, contract loans, and issue bonds, certificates, warrants, notes, or other evidence of indebtedness and may pledge the special assessment power of the district to pay such debts for the purpose of financing certain capital projects; conditioning the exercise of such power by a neighborhood improvement district on approval by the governing board of the district, city commission, and electors of the district, etc.
Title
City of Lauderhill, Broward County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H943 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1496 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
S1496 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/992 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0992/BillText/Filed/HTML |