FL S1496 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a city ordinance creating a neighborhood improvement district may authorize the district to borrow money, contract loans, and issue bonds, certificates, warrants, notes, or other evidence of indebtedness and may pledge the special assessment power of the district to pay such debts for the purpose of financing certain capital projects; specifying characteristics of such bonds and loans, etc.
Title
Neighborhood Improvement Districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/03/17, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H943 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S992 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
S992 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1496 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1496/BillText/Filed/HTML |