FL H0947 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes standard of care for telehealth providers; authorizes use of telehealth to perform patient evaluations; provides that telehealth providers, under certain circumstances, are not required to research patient's history or conduct physical exam before providing services; provides situations when use of telehealth is not deemed to be practicing medicine without a license; authorizes certain providers to use telehealth to prescribe specified controlled substances; requires DOH to develop & disseminate educational materials to specified licenses; provides recordkeeping requirements; provides patient consent requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telehealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H23 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S1526 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 23

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4564501Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback