FL S1526 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 23
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing standards of practice for telehealth providers; providing that a nonphysician telehealth provider using telehealth and acting within his or her relevant scope of practice is not deemed to be practicing medicine without a license; prohibiting a contract between a certain health insurer and a telehealth provider from requiring the telehealth provider to be reimbursed at lesser amount than if the service were provided in person; prohibiting a contract between a certain health maintenance organization and a telehealth provider from requiring the telehealth provider to be reimbursed at lesser amount than if the service were provided in-person, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telehealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 23
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 23
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-22SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-22SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-18SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 6
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (862704); YEAS 6 NAYS 4
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-25SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-25SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H23 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
H947 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4564501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45647Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742396Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131093Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526/Amendment/763358/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526/Amendment/809042/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526/Amendment/648844/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526/Amendment/277068/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526/Amendment/862704/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526/Amendment/147794/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526/Amendment/810132/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526/Amendment/409632/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1526/Amendment/395174/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback