FL H1009 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes conversion of vehicle titled or branded & registered as low-speed vehicle to golf cart; provides procedures; revises definition of term "low-speed vehicle" to include vehicles that are not electric powered.
Title
Low-Speed Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] | Rep. Marlene O'Toole [R] | House Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee | House Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#841 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch. | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Transportation; Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; Budget -SJ 825 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 825 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 761 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 761 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 713 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-17 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 684 | |
2012-02-17 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 684 | |
2012-02-15 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/17/12, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-15 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 631 | |
2012-02-14 | CS/CS by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 599 | |
2012-02-14 | CS/CS by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 602 | |
2012-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/14/12, 11:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-26 | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 297 | |
2012-01-25 | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 281 | |
2012-01-25 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-24 | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 284 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 01/24/12, 8:15 am, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 99 | |
2011-12-28 | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 99 | |
2011-12-12 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
319 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |