FL H1041 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises eligibility requirements for review of sentences for offenses committed while juvenile; revises duties of DOC concerning reviews; revises procedures for initiating review; provides for appointment of counsel; provides requirements for hearings; requires court to render written ruling; requires court to consider specified additional factors; requires annual report; provides for retroactive application.
Title
Review of Juvenile Sentences
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-08 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S930 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1041 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1041/BillText/Filed/PDF |