FL H1111 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle rental company or peer-to-peer car-sharing program to pay surcharge; authorizes electronic copy of rental or lease documentation to be presented to law enforcement officer or DHSMV agent; provides that act of presenting electronic device does not constitute consent to access other information on device; provides for liability for device damage; revises documentation and recordkeeping requirements; prohibits person from renting motor vehicle to another person unless renter is duly licensed & renter's driver license is unexpired; requires car-sharing service, motor vehicle rental company, or peer-to-peer car-sharing program to enter into agreement with publicly owned airport in order to provide transportation services.
Title
Vehicles for Rent or Lease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Ways and Means Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-29 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | CS referred to Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-28 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1148 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
H1053 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
H385 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
H1053 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
H385 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 0606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |