FL H1175 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises certain corporate boundaries; provides that, for purposes of complying with s. 218.23(1), Florida Statutes, millages levied within municipal service taxing units may be used for an indefinite period of time.
Title
Martin County; Village of Indiantown
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#111 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#111 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Chapter No. 2019-179 | |
2019-05-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 05/01/19 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-25 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/25/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-19 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |