FL H1187 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to certain rules adopted by AHCA & anatomical gifts; prohibits organ transplantation facility from charging certain persons for specified services; revises duties of Organ & Tissue Procurement & Transplantation Advisory Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organ Donation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#601 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in returning Messages
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-11HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-11SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10SenateAmendment(s) adopted (422452)
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1516
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-18HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-02-07HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-07HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-07HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-07HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-06HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1516 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1187

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7655155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
765517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
765522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
765543Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback