FL H1193 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemptions from public records requirements for personal identifying & location information of victims of domestic violence, repeat violence, sexual violence, & dating violence held by clerks & law enforcement agencies in conjunction with automated process developed by Florida Association of Court Clerks & Comptrollers by which petitioner may request notification of service of injunction for protection; provides that exemption is conditional upon petitioner's request; provides specified duration of exemption; provides for access by state or federal agencies in furtherance of agencies' statutory duties; provides for future review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Victims of Violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#890 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#890 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1146 | |
2012-03-06 | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 878 | |
2012-03-06 | Read 3rd time -SJ 878 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 790 | |
2012-03-01 | Received -SJ 828 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 765 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 786 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 786 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 731 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-06 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 525 | |
2012-02-02 | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time -HJ 448 | |
2012-02-02 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-01 | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 456 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/01/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 284 | |
2012-01-25 | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 284 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 01/25/12, 8:00 am, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-19 | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 234 | |
2012-01-19 | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee -HJ 235 | |
2012-01-18 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 238 | |
2012-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 117 | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 117 | |
2012-01-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
741 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |