FL H1277 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises criteria for involuntary examination; deletes requirement that less restrictive means be unavailable before law enforcement officer may take person into custody for involuntary examination; deletes prohibition on a fee for filing for involuntary examination order specifies when involuntary patient is eligible for discharge; revises discharge requirements.
Title
Mental Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1736 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 4625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 469 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1277 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1277/BillText/Filed/PDF |