FL H4039 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to recreation centers, use & acquisition of land, & equipment & maintenance; supervision; playground & recreation boards; cooperation with other units & boards; gifts, grants, devises, & bequests; issuance of bonds; petition for referendum; resolution or ordinance providing for recreation system; tax levy; payment of expenses & custody of funds; & duties & functions of Division of Recreation & Parks of DEP.
Title
Recreation and Parks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#642 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#642 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1146 | |
2012-03-06 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 875 | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 874 | |
2012-03-01 | Received -SJ 762 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 762 | |
2012-02-02 | In Messages | |
2012-01-25 | Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 269 | |
2012-01-25 | Read 3rd time -HJ 269 | |
2012-01-24 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-01-24 | Read 2nd time -HJ 255 | |
2012-01-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/12 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 148 | |
2011-12-08 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 177 | |
2011-12-08 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 177 | |
2011-12-01 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 12/08/11, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-11-15 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 173 | |
2011-11-15 | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 173 | |
2011-11-08 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 11/15/11, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-10-03 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 148 | |
2011-09-15 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
418 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |