FL H4163 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to requirement for athletic trainers & massage therapists to complete continuing education on modes of transmission, infection control procedures, clinical management, & prevention of human immunodeficiency virus & acquired immune deficiency syndrome.
Title
Continuing Education for Athletic Trainers and Massage Therapists
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Hudson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#769 (Y: 103 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#769 (Y: 103 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1147 | |
2012-03-06 | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 877 | |
2012-03-06 | Read 3rd time -SJ 877 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 789 | |
2012-03-01 | Received -SJ 763 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 763 | |
2012-02-22 | In Messages | |
2012-02-16 | Passed; YEAS 103 NAYS 16 -HJ 639 | |
2012-02-16 | Read 3rd time -HJ 638 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-15 | Read 2nd time -HJ 621 | |
2012-02-13 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/15/12 | |
2012-02-07 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 549 | |
2012-02-07 | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1 -HJ 549 | |
2012-02-03 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/07/12, 1:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-17 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 229 | |
2012-01-17 | Favorable by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 229 | |
2012-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 8:00 am, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 154 | |
2011-12-28 | Referred to Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 154 | |
2011-12-16 | Filed |