FL H5007 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises required employer retirement contribution rates for each membership class & subclass of FRS; provides declaration of important state interest.
Title
State-administered Retirement Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#430 (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#430 (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chapter No. 2020-116 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-02-13 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Substituted for SB 7044 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-13 | House | Immediately certified |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 5 |
2020-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/12/20 |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7044 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5007
H5001 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-111
S2500 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
H5001 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-111
S2500 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001