FL S0018 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Barney Brown, who was wrongfully incarcerated for 38 years; providing an appropriation to compensate him for his wrongful incarceration; providing that the appropriation satisfies all present and future claims related to the arrest, conviction, and incarceration of Barney Brown, etc.
Title
Relief of Barney Brown by the State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6511 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/18 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/18/BillText/Filed/HTML |