FL S0184 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Holocaust Education Act of 2020"; requiring charter school instructional personnel to teach specified topics; requiring certain private school instructional personnel to teach specified topics; revising the requirements for instructional content relating to the Holocaust that members of public school instructional staff are required to teach; requiring the Department of Education to coordinate with school districts to appoint Holocaust curriculum coordinators, etc.
Title
Holocaust Education in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Education |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H91 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
S1660 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S1660 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/184 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/184/BillText/Filed/HTML |