FL S0204 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Florida Hospital Patient Protection Act"; requiring that each health care facility implement a staffing plan that provides minimum direct care registered nurse staffing levels; prohibiting a health care facility from assigning unlicensed personnel to perform functions or tasks that should be performed by a licensed or registered nurse; requiring a direct care registered nurse to initiate action or to change a decision or an activity relating to a patient's health care under certain circumstances; prohibiting a health care facility from interfering with the right of direct care registered nurses to organize, bargain collectively, and engage in concerted activity under a federal act, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delivery of Nursing Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Health Policy
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-08-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H651 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951014Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback