FL S0208 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that physical examinations are included in support services for purposes of the student support services team program; exempting a child from the adolescent well-care examination upon a parent's written request stating objections on religious grounds; requiring that district school boards and private school governing authorities require and enforce as a policy that certain children present proof of an adolescent well-care examination each year; requiring district school boards and private school governing authorities to refuse to admit children who fail to present proof of such examination, etc.
Title
Wellness Examinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations; Rules |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1235 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/208 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/208/BillText/Filed/HTML |