FL S0270 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing the repeal of Section 7 of Article VI of the State Constitution which requires the availability of public financing of campaigns of candidates for elective statewide office who agree to campaign spending limits, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal of Public Campaign Financing Requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-03-05SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules
2019-01-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S272 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H613 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H615 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback