FL S0480 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to develop a Highwaymen license plate; providing for distribution and use of fees collected from the sale of the plates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates/Highwaymen

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-04SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2019-04-04SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2019-04-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-02SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-01-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S482 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H199 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H201 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H505 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1104 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback