FL S0600 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to annually recognize January 1 as "Haitian Independence Day," May 18 as "Haitian Flag Day," and the month of May as "Haitian Heritage Month", etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognition of Haitian Independence Day, Haitian Flag Day, and Haitian Heritage Month

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
2016-03-04HouseIn Messages
2016-03-04SenateAdopted
2016-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2016-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16
2016-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2016-02-29SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2016-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/29/16, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2016-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/24/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2016-02-16SenateNow in Rules
2016-02-16SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2016-02-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/16/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2015-11-04SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2015-10-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0333 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
H0069 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
S0568 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
H9057 (Similar To) 2016-03-02 - Adopted by Publication

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback