FL S0684 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding provisions that require an agency, university, college, school district, or other political subdivision of the state to provide preferential consideration to a Florida business in awarding competitively bid contracts to purchase personal property to include the purchase of construction services; requiring counties and municipalities to provide such preferential consideration; providing that for specified competitive solicitations the authority to grant preference supersedes any local ordinance or regulation that restricts specified contractors from competing for an award based upon certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preference in Award of State Contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03SenateDied in Community Affairs
2013-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/09/13, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2013-04-03SenateNow in Community Affairs
2013-04-02SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
2013-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/02/13, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced
2013-02-13SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Appropriations; Rules
2013-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0307 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
H1017 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287084Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback