FL S0794 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that parenting plans provide that either parent may consent to mental health treatment for the child if the court orders shared parental responsibility; providing that the responsibility for the health care costs for the mental health treatment of the child shall be governed by the marital settlement agreement or court order, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dissolution of Marriage Parenting Plans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241)
2016-03-04HouseIn Messages
2016-03-04SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2016-03-04SenateRead 3rd time
2016-03-03SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2016-03-03SenateRead 2nd time
2016-03-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/16
2016-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2016-02-29SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2016-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/29/16, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2016-02-18SenateCS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2016-02-18SenateNow in Rules
2016-02-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2016-02-17SenateCS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 1
2016-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/17/16, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2016-02-11SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2016-02-11SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2016-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2016-02-09SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2016-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/09/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2015-11-19SenateReferred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2015-11-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0615 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241)
S0012 (Similar To) 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-241, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 373 (Ch. 2016-80), CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2016-127), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6113Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback