FL S0838 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing certain exemptions from the tax imposed on rental or license fees charged for the use of commercial real property; providing for the future repeal of s. 212.031, F.S., relating to the imposition of a tax on the rental or license fees charged for the use of commercial real property, etc.
Title
Tax on Commercial Real Property
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] | Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0223 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See HB 7109
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1258 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 840 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/838 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0838/BillText/Filed/HTML |