FL S0856 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Unfavorable by Rules, laid on Table; YEAS 6 NAYS 6
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Unfavorable by Rules, laid on Table; YEAS 6 NAYS 6
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a district school board from awarding an annual contract for instructional personnel under certain circumstances; prohibiting a district school board from altering or limiting its authority to award or not award an annual contract under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Unfavorable by Rules, laid on Table; YEAS 6 NAYS 6 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/28/17, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 2 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/24/17, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/17/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 04/03/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0373 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education