FL S1028 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring consumer credit reporting agencies to report certain adverse credit information as neutral credit information; requiring persons, entities, and creditors to treat certain adverse credit information as neutral credit information; prohibiting creditors from denying credit to a consumer based solely upon certain adverse credit information, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied in Banking and Insurance
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-02-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0385 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5010119Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback