FL S1182 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a paramedic or emergency medical technician to provide other treatment and transport options; providing immunity from liability for certain medical and law enforcement personnel providing emergency examination and treatment of incapacitated persons in certain circumstances; authorizing a certified paramedic to administer a controlled substance only under the supervision of certain health care practitioners, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Medical Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H931 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1433Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401272Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback