FL S1198 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Patient Compensation System Trust Fund within the State Treasury; providing the purpose of the trust fund; providing for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund, etc.
Title
Patient Compensation System Trust Fund/State Treasury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Rules |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1200 (Related) 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
H1111 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H1109 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H1111 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H1109 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1198 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1198/BillText/Filed/HTML |