FL S1206 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Agency for Persons with Disabilities to establish a certification process for registered behavior technicians; requiring the agency to recognize the certification of registered behavior technicians awarded by a nonprofit corporation that meets specified requirements; providing an exemption from licensure requirements for certain individuals who are employed or under contract with certain entities providing applied behavior analysis services; revising the definition of the term "private instructional personnel" to include certain registered behavior technicians, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applied Behavior Analysis Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-02-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/25/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-02-06SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-04SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-12-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H575 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45647Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276686Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131098Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback