FL S1326 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the method for determining the cost-of-living adjustment of benefits for retirees and annuitants of the Florida Retirement System on and after a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2016-01-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2016-01-11SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
2016-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1011 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121101Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback