FL S1452 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Canadian Prescription Drug Importation Program within the Agency for Health Care Administration for a specified purpose; providing eligibility criteria for prescription drugs, for Canadian suppliers, and for importers under the program; requiring the agency to request federal approval of the program; providing requirements for such request; requiring the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to establish the International Prescription Drug Importation Program for a specified purpose, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Importation Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H19 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Chapter No. 2019-99
S1528 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)
H7073 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38102035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4990051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4990285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback