FL S1468 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that certain information may be considered proprietary business information; requiring that a permit be obtained before the performance of any high pressure well stimulation; prohibiting the department from approving any permit for a high pressure well stimulation until rulemaking is complete; prohibiting a county, municipality, or other political subdivision of the state from adopting or establishing permitting programs for certain oil and gas activities, etc.
Title
Regulation of Oil and Gas Resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1205 (Died on Calendar in Senate) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 13 NAYS 6 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/14/15, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/31/15, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1205 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
S1582 (Related) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
H1209 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
S0314 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table
S1582 (Related) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
H1209 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
S0314 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
377 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 2425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 2436 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |