FL S1552 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from altering the trademark of a manufacturer, rectifier, bottler, or brand owner on products shipped into this state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensure as an American Source of Supply

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02SenateDied in Regulated Industries
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced
2014-03-05SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary
2014-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1201 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
56114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
564045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
565095Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback