FL S7102 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Submit as committee bill by Budget (SB 2108)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Submit as committee bill by Budget (SB 2108)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to the Office of Adoption and Child Protection within the Executive Office of the Governor. Requires all state, county, and local agencies to cooperate, assist, and provide information to the Department of Children and Family Services rather than the Office of Adoption and Child Protection. Repeals provisions relating to the definition of the term "office" as it relates to the Office of Adoption and Child Protection, etc.
Title
Welfare of Children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Submit as committee bill by Budget (SB 2108) | |
2011-03-31 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/02/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/01/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Submitted as Committee Bill | |
2011-03-28 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/31/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-03-27 | Submitted for consideration by Budget |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7102 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7102/BillText/Filed/HTML |