HI HB991 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the process for obtaining a court order for involuntary outpatient treatment. Replaces the term "involuntary outpatient treatment" with "assisted community treatment" and makes amendments to existing judicial procedures. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB991 HD1)
Title
Mental Health; Assisted Community Treatment; Court Order
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cheape; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB310 (Same As) 2013-07-02 - Act 221, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).