HI SB1347 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1347
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds new tax credit for teacher's expenses. Adds an inflation index for the income tax brackets, personal exemption amount and standard deduction amounts. Increases the amounts for the income tax brackets, personal exemption amount and standard deduction amounts for tax year 2023. Increases the adjusted gross income amounts for the qualification of low-income credits. Increases the amount of the credits that assist working families.
Title
Relating To Income Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1049 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
SB1347 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
SB1347 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1347&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1347_.HTM |