HI SB21 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB21
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning January 1, , establishes a zero net vehicle growth policy in the State to ensure that the number of vehicles in the State does not exceed the vehicle threshold. Prohibits the importation of a vehicle into the State unless the dealer or individual importing the vehicle demonstrates proof that an existing vehicle in the State was recycled, destroyed, or transported out of the State and the importation of the vehicle does not cause the total number of vehicles in the State to exceed the vehicle threshold. Requires proof of compliance for dealers and individuals importing vehicles into the State.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS/CPN, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB21 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Re-Referred to TRS/CPN, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=21&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB21_.HTM |